WI SB520 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-13)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Published 4-9-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-13)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Published 4-9-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 20.866 (2) (uz) of the statutes; Relating to: a new juvenile correctional facility in Milwaukee County and granting bonding authority. (FE)
Title
A new juvenile correctional facility in Milwaukee County and granting bonding authority. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in as amended (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Senate | Published 4-9-2022 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 4-8-2022. 2021 Wisconsin Act 252 |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-4-2022 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Action ordered immediately messaged |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Assembly Amendment 1 concurred in |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 1 rejected |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Senator L. Taylor |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-8-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Report concurrence of Assembly Amendment 1 recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee on Senate Organization and rereferred to joint committee on Finance pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c) |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Received from Assembly amended and concurred in as amended, Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2022-02-24 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-24 | House | Representative Allen added as a cosponsor |
2022-02-24 | House | Read a third time and concurred in as amended, Ayes 90, Noes 0 |
2022-02-24 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-02-24 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-24 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2022-02-24 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Schraa and Born |
2022-02-24 | House | Read a second time |
2022-02-24 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from Senate message and take up |
2022-02-24 | House | Read |
2022-02-23 | House | Received from Senate |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 33, Noes 0 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Read a second time |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-22-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Representative Snyder added as a cosponsor |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senator Darling added as a coauthor |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2022-02-07 | Senate | LRB correction |
2021-10-08 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Introduced |