WI SB519 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2)
Status: Passed on April 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-15 - Published 4-16-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2)
Status: Passed on April 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-15 - Published 4-16-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 813.12 (4) (d) 1m., 813.122 (5) (dm) 1m., 813.123 (5) (d) 1m. and 813.125 (4) (d) 1m. of the statutes; Relating to: permanent restraining orders for victims of sexual assault.
Title
Permanent restraining orders for victims of sexual assault.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-15 | Senate | Published 4-16-2022 |
2022-04-15 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 4-15-2022. 2021 Wisconsin Act 256 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-14-2022 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Action ordered immediately messaged |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Assembly Amendment 1 concurred in |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-8-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Received from Assembly amended and concurred in as amended, Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2022-02-23 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-23 | House | Read a third time and concurred in as amended |
2022-02-23 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-02-23 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-23 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2022-02-23 | House | Read a second time |
2022-02-22 | House | Made a special order of business at 8:19 AM on 2-23-2022 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29 |
2022-02-17 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-15 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Dittrich |
2022-01-25 | House | Received from Senate |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 2 adopted |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Read a second time |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senator Carpenter added as a coauthor |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Placed on calendar 1-25-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 2 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 6, Noes 0 |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Senator Petrowski |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Petrowski |
2021-09-23 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-09-20 | Senate | Representative James added as a cosponsor |
2021-08-19 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2021-08-19 | Senate | Introduced |