WI SB508 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 25.29 (1) (a), 29.219 (4), 29.229 (2) (i), 29.2295 (2) (i), 29.231 (2), 29.236 (2), 29.563 (3) (a) 3. and 29.624 (1); and to create 25.17 (1) (jf), 25.29 (1) (g), 25.299, 29.219 (2g), 29.229 (2) (gm), 29.2295 (2) (gm) and 29.563 (3) (a) 4g. of the statutes; Relating to: a resident lifetime fishing license, a lifetime fishing trust fund, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
A resident lifetime fishing license, a lifetime fishing trust fund, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-12-17 | Senate | Representative Doyle added as a cosponsor |
2019-12-06 | Senate | Representative Brooks added as a cosponsor |
2019-11-11 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-10-18 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Sporting Heritage, Mining and Forestry |
2019-10-18 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb508 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB508.pdf |