WI SB508 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 29.014 (1m) (a) and 29.016 (1) (b); and to create 29.016 (3) of the statutes; Relating to: establishing an open season for hunting deer with muzzle-loading firearms within the Apostle Islands National Lakeshore.
Title
Establishing an open season for hunting deer with muzzle-loading firearms within the Apostle Islands National Lakeshore.
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Tiffany [R] | Sen. Janet Bewley [D] | Sen. Terry Moulton [R] | Sen. Mark Miller [D] |
Rep. Beth Meyers [D] | Rep. Joel Kleefisch [R] | Rep. Nick Milroy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-12-12 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-12-12 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Sporting Heritage, Mining and Forestry, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2017-12-12 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2017-11-28 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-11-06 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Sporting Heritage, Mining and Forestry |
2017-11-06 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb508 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB508.pdf |