WI SB505 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 60.23 (32) (b) 1. of the statutes; Relating to: allowing the Town of Cable in Bayfield County to create a tax incremental district in the same manner as a city or village. (FE)
Title
Allowing the Town of Cable in Bayfield County to create a tax incremental district in the same manner as a city or village. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Petrowski [R] | Sen. Janet Bewley [D] | Sen. Romaine Quinn [R] | Rep. Beth Meyers [D] |
Rep. James Edming [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Representative Barca added as a cosponsor |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Economic Development, Commerce and Local Government, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by Committee on Economic Development, Commerce and Local Government, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Economic Development, Commerce and Local Government, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2018-01-04 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Petrowski |
2018-01-04 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Petrowski |
2017-12-12 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-11-03 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-10-27 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Economic Development, Commerce and Local Government |
2017-10-27 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb505 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB505.pdf |