WI SB502 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 115.7915 (4m) (em), 118.40 (2r) (e) 3n., 118.40 (2x) (e) 3., 118.60 (4) (d) and 119.23 (4) (d) of the statutes; Relating to: payments for pupils who withdraw from a parental choice program, the Special Needs Scholarship Program, or an independent charter school. (FE)
Title
Payments for pupils who withdraw from a parental choice program, the Special Needs Scholarship Program, or an independent charter school. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Representative Emerson added as a cosponsor |
2023-11-15 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-10-19 | Senate | Representative Billings added as a cosponsor |
2023-10-16 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2023-10-16 | Senate | Introduced |