WI SB50 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 16-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Published 4-24-2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 16-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Published 4-24-2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 104.045 (1) of the statutes; Relating to: counting of tips for tipped employees and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Counting of tips for tipped employees and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-13 - House - Assembly: Decision of the Chair upheld (Y: 54 N: 37 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | Senate | Published 4-24-2021 |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 4-23-2021. 2021 Wisconsin Act 26 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-22-2021 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2021-04-13 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-04-13 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2021-04-13 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-04-13 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-04-13 | House | Decision of the Chair upheld, Ayes 54, Noes 37 |
2021-04-13 | House | Decision of the Chair appealed |
2021-04-13 | House | Point of order that Assembly Amendment 1 not germane under Assembly Rule 54 (3)(f) well taken |
2021-04-13 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Anderson, S. Rodriguez, Andraca, Baldeh, Billings, Bowen, Brostoff, Cabrera, Conley, Considine, Doyle, Drake, Emerson, Goyke, Haywood, Hebl, Hesselbein, Hintz, Hong, McGuire, B. Meyers, Milroy, Moore Omokunde, L. Myers, Neubauer, Ohnstad, Ortiz-Velez, Pope, Riemer, Shankland, Shelton, Sinicki, Snodgrass, Spreitzer, Stubbs, Subeck, Vining and Vruwink |
2021-04-13 | House | Read a second time |
2021-04-13 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on calendar 4-13-2021 by Committee on Rules |
2021-04-08 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2021-02-16 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Read a second time |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-16-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Introduced |