WI SB496 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 20.144 (1) (g); and to create 20.144 (1) (c), 20.144 (1) (cd) and 224.56 of the statutes; Relating to: a retirement plan marketplace, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
A retirement plan marketplace, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-09-08 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-08-18 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-08-12 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-08-05 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Revenue |
2021-08-05 | Senate | Introduced |