WI SB492 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-1)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-1)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 341.307; to amend 25.40 (1) (a) 3. and 84.59 (2) (b); and to create 341.14 (3m) and 341.147 of the statutes; Relating to: motor vehicle fleet registration and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Motor vehicle fleet registration and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 11, Noes 4 |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Report introduction of Senate Amendment 1 by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-10-14 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee on Senate Organization and rereferred to joint committee on Finance pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c) |
2021-09-22 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-09-22 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation and Local Government, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2021-09-22 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-09-09 | Senate | Representative Knodl added as a cosponsor |
2021-09-07 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-09-02 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Representative Plumer added as a cosponsor |
2021-08-05 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Local Government |
2021-08-05 | Senate | Introduced |