WI SB492 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create chapter 461 of the statutes; Relating to: providing complementary and alternative health care practitioners with exemptions from practice protection laws, requirements and prohibitions for individuals who provide complementary and alternative health care services, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Providing complementary and alternative health care practitioners with exemptions from practice protection laws, requirements and prohibitions for individuals who provide complementary and alternative health care services, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Tiffany |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Representative James added as a cosponsor |
2019-10-31 | Senate | Representative Wichgers added as a cosponsor |
2019-10-31 | Senate | Senator Bernier added as a coauthor |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Representative Edming added as a cosponsor |
2019-10-29 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-10-11 | Senate | Representative Thiesfeldt added as a cosponsor |
2019-10-10 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2019-10-10 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb492 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB492.pdf |