WI SB491 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 945.01 (1) (b); and to create chapter 570 of the statutes; Relating to: registration of fantasy contest operators, requiring the exercise of rule-making authority, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Registration of fantasy contest operators, requiring the exercise of rule-making authority, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Feyen [R] | Sen. Lena Taylor [D] | Rep. Tyler Vorpagel [R] | Rep. Jonathan Brostoff [D] |
Rep. Christine Sinicki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-11-15 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-11-01 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-10-22 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-10-18 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-10-10 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions |
2019-10-10 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb491 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB491.pdf |