WI SB490 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 103.10 (15) of the statutes; Relating to: exempting from the state family and medical leave law an employer that is covered under the federal family and medical leave law. (FE)
Title
Exempting from the state family and medical leave law an employer that is covered under the federal family and medical leave law. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-10-27 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform |
2017-10-27 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb490 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB490.pdf |