WI SB487 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 36.27 (2) (bm) and 38.22 (6) (h) of the statutes; Relating to: resident tuition at University of Wisconsin System institutions and technical colleges for children and spouses of certain members of the armed forces. (FE)
Title
Resident tuition at University of Wisconsin System institutions and technical colleges for children and spouses of certain members of the armed forces. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-09-02 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-08-18 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-08-05 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities and Technical Colleges |
2021-08-05 | Senate | Introduced |