WI SB483 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-8)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-8)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 66.1110 (4) (c); to amend 66.1109 (2) (c), 66.1109 (2m) (c), 66.1109 (4m) (c), 66.1110 (3) (c), 66.1110 (3) (e), 66.1110 (4m) (c), 66.1110 (5) and 66.1110 (6) (b) 3.; and to create 66.1109 (1) (ce), 66.1109 (3) (e), 66.1109 (6), 66.1110 (4) (c) 1., 66.1110 (4) (c) 2., 66.1110 (4) (cg), 66.1110 (4) (cr) and 66.1110 (4) (e) of the statutes; Relating to: authorizing the creation of multijurisdictional business improvement districts, changes to public annual reports for neighborhood improvement districts, and changes to certain notifications for both types of districts. (FE)
Title
Authorizing the creation of multijurisdictional business improvement districts, changes to public annual reports for neighborhood improvement districts, and changes to certain notifications for both types of districts. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Economic Development, Commerce and Trade, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-10-18 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-10-10 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Economic Development, Commerce and Trade |
2019-10-10 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb483 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB483.pdf |