WI SB483 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Published 4-17-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Published 4-17-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 115.45 (1) (b); and to create 115.45 (1) (b) 2. of the statutes; Relating to: robotics league participation grants.
Title
Robotics league participation grants.
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Nass [R] | Rep. Adam Neylon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | Senate | Published 4-17-2018 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 4-16-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 315 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-12-2018 |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2018-02-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-02-20 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2018-02-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-02-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-02-20 | House | Read a second time |
2018-02-20 | House | Rules suspended and taken up |
2018-02-20 | House | Read |
2018-02-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Read a second time |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-20-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Representative Kooyenga added as a cosponsor |
2017-12-22 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-12-22 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2017-12-21 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2017-12-19 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-10-27 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2017-10-27 | Senate | Introduced |