WI SB475 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-05 - Published 4-16-2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-05 - Published 4-16-2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 214.37 (4) (a), 214.725 (2), 214.772 (5), 214.82 (1) (a), 214.82 (1) (j), 214.825 and 215.33 (4); and to repeal and recreate 214.76 and 215.25 of the statutes; relating to: audits and reports of state savings banks and state savings and loan associations. (FE)
Title
Audits and reports of state savings banks and state savings and loan associations. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Grothman [R] | Sen. Dale Schultz [R] | Rep. Daniel LeMahieu [R] | Rep. Garey Bies [R] |
Sen. Duey Stroebel [R] | Rep. Travis Tranel [R] | Sen. Joan Ballweg [R] | Rep. Josh Zepnick [D] |
Rep. Jason Fields [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-05 | Senate | Published 4-16-2012 |
2012-04-03 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 4-2-2012. 2011 Wisconsin Act 182 |
2012-03-30 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 3-30-2012 |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled on 3-28-2012 |
2012-03-13 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2012-03-13 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2012-03-13 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2012-03-13 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-03-13 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2012-03-13 | House | Read a second time |
2012-03-06 | House | Made a special order of business at 11:31 A.M. on 3-13-2012 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 22 |
2012-03-06 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2012-03-06 | House | Received from Senate |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Senate amendment 1 adopted |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Senate amendment 1 offered by Senator Grothman |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Read a second time |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Placed at the foot of the calendar of 03-06-2012 |
2012-03-05 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-6-2012 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2012-02-29 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2012-02-29 | Senate | Report passage recommended by committee on Financial Institutions and Rural Issues, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2012-02-29 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2012-02-21 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2012-02-16 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Financial Institutions and Rural Issues |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Introduced |