WI SB465 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-8)
Status: Failed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to repeal 15.407 (9) and 440.032; to amend 440.032 (3) (b) 3. and 905.015 (2) (intro.); and to create 15.405 (18) and chapter 471 of the statutes; Relating to: regulation of sign language interpretation services, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, granting rule-making authority, and providing a criminal penalty. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regulation of sign language interpretation services, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, granting rule-making authority, and providing a criminal penalty. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-29SenateFailed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2018-02-06SenateSenator L. Taylor added as a coauthor
2017-12-07SenateRepresentative Barca added as a cosponsor
2017-12-04SenateRepresentative Zepnick added as a cosponsor
2017-11-03SenateFiscal estimate received
2017-10-18SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Public Benefits, Licensing and State-Federal Relations
2017-10-18SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback