WI SB463 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 118.01 (1); and to create 118.01 (3) of the statutes; Relating to: requiring school boards to make information about learning materials and educational activities used for pupil instruction available to the public. (FE)
Title
Requiring school boards to make information about learning materials and educational activities used for pupil instruction available to the public. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-28 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 60 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-28 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-28 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 2 adopted (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-28 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-28 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 2 adopted (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-17 | Senate | Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82 |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Placed on calendar 5-17-2022 pursuant to Joint Rule 82 (2)(a) |
2021-12-06 | Senate | Report vetoed by the Governor on 12-3-2021 |
2021-12-02 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 12-2-2021 |
2021-10-08 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2021-09-29 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2021-09-28 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-09-28 | House | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 60, Noes 38 |
2021-09-28 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-09-28 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-09-28 | House | Read a second time |
2021-09-28 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from Senate message and take up |
2021-09-28 | House | Read |
2021-09-28 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 19, Noes 12 |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 adopted, Ayes 18, Noes 12 |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Read a second time |
2021-09-27 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Stroebel |
2021-09-24 | Senate | Placed on calendar 9-28-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-09-24 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-09-24 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 4, Noes 3 |
2021-09-23 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-09-16 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Stroebel |
2021-08-20 | Senate | Representative Steffen added as a cosponsor |
2021-08-18 | Senate | Representative Allen added as a cosponsor |
2021-08-11 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-08-09 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-08-05 | Senate | Representative Plumer added as a cosponsor |
2021-08-04 | Senate | Representative Penterman added as a cosponsor |
2021-07-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2021-07-21 | Senate | Introduced |