WI SB463 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Passed on March 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-02 - Published 3-1-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Passed on March 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-02 - Published 3-1-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 167.33 (1) (d), 167.33 (3) (g) 1. and 167.33 (3) (g) 2.; to renumber 167.33 (1) (a); to renumber and amend 167.33 (1) (c), 167.33 (1) (o), 167.33 (3) (b) and 167.33 (3) (g) (intro.); to amend 15.347 (20) (b) 6., 167.33 (title), 167.33 (1) (b), 167.33 (1) (f), 167.33 (1) (g), 167.33 (1) (h), 167.33 (1) (L), 167.33 (1) (m), 167.33 (2) (title), 167.33 (2) (b) 1., 167.33 (2) (f), 167.33 (2) (h), 167.33 (3) (a), 167.33 (3) (f) (intro.), 167.33 (3) (f) 5., 167.33 (3) (f) 6., 167.33 (3) (h), 167.33 (3) (j) 1., 167.33 (3) (j) 2., 167.33 (4) (a), 167.33 (4) (ag), 167.33 (4) (b) 2., 167.33 (5) (title), 167.33 (5) (a) 13., 167.33 (5) (b) 11., 895.525 (2) (b), 895.526 (title), 895.526 (2) (title), 895.526 (2) (a), 895.526 (2) (b), 895.526 (2) (c), 895.526 (2) (d), 895.526 (3) (intro.), 895.526 (3) (b) and 895.526 (4) (a); and to create 167.33 (1) (ar), 167.33 (1) (dm), 167.33 (3) (am), 167.33 (3) (b) 2., 167.33 (3) (em) and 167.33 (5) (c) of the statutes; Relating to: duties of ski area operators and persons who bike in a ski area, and liability of ski area operators.
Title
Duties of ski area operators and persons who bike in a ski area, and liability of ski area operators.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-02 | Senate | Published 3-1-2016 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 2-29-2016. 2015 Wisconsin Act 168 |
2016-02-26 | Senate | LRB correction |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 2-25-2016 |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2016-02-09 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-09 | House | Representative Heaton added as a cosponsor |
2016-02-09 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2016-02-09 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-02-09 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-09 | House | Read a second time |
2016-02-04 | House | Placed on calendar 2-9-2016 by Committee on Rules |
2016-01-25 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2016-01-21 | House | Received from Senate |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Read a second time |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Placed on calendar 1-20-2016 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2016-01-15 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2016-01-15 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Small Business, and Tourism, Ayes 6, Noes 3 |
2016-01-15 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Small Business, and Tourism, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Erpenbach |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Stroebel |
2015-12-18 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Small Business, and Tourism |
2015-12-18 | Senate | Introduced |