WI SB46 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-4)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 20.455 (2) (hd) and 48.48 (19); and to create 20.437 (1) (hf), 814.75 (28), 814.76 (21), 944.35 and 973.05 (2m) (fr) of the statutes; Relating to: prostitution crime surcharge and making an appropriation. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prostitution crime surcharge and making an appropriation. (FE)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18HouseRead first time and referred to committee on Rules
2019-06-05HouseReceived from Senate
2019-06-05SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2019-06-05SenateRead a third time and passed, Ayes 32, Noes 0
2019-06-05SenateRules suspended
2019-06-05SenateOrdered to a third reading
2019-06-05SenateSenate Amendment 1 adopted
2019-06-05SenateRead a second time
2019-06-03SenatePlaced on calendar 6-5-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2019-06-03SenateWithdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2
2019-06-03SenateReferred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2
2019-04-03SenateFiscal estimate received
2019-04-02SenateAvailable for scheduling
2019-04-02SenateReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0
2019-04-02SenateReport adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0
2019-04-02SenateExecutive action taken
2019-04-01SenateSenate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Jacque
2019-03-28SenateFiscal estimate received
2019-03-20SenateFiscal estimate received
2019-03-19SenatePublic hearing held
2019-03-15SenateFiscal estimate received
2019-03-07SenateFiscal estimate received
2019-02-25SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
2019-02-25SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback