WI SB457 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Passed on November 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-26 - Published 11-26-2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to repeal 15.07 (1) (b) 5., 15.07 (5) (g), 15.185 (3) and 227.53 (1) (b) 2.; to amend 15.07 (1) (b) 1., 15.07 (5) (b), 15.185 (1), 71.91 (6) (c) 1., 71.91 (6) (d) 1., 214.01 (1) (sr), 215.01 (22), 220.02 (5), 220.035 (title), 220.035 (1) (a), 220.035 (2), 220.035 (3), 220.035 (6), 220.04 (1) (a), 220.04 (4), 220.04 (6), 220.04 (7) (b) (intro.), 220.04 (8), 220.04 (9) (f) 2., 220.04 (12), 220.05 (2), 220.06 (1m), 220.06 (2), 220.07 (2), 220.08 (1), 220.08 (3a), 220.08 (9), 220.085, 221.0202 (5), 221.0205, 221.0324 (9), 221.0702 (3), 221.1006, 223.01, 224.725 (1), 227.52 (3), 227.53 (1) (a) 1., 227.53 (1) (b) 4., 227.53 (1) (d), 403.312 (2) (c) 1., 705.04 (2) (intro.), 705.04 (2g), 705.06 (3) and 812.18 (1); and to create 71.91 (6) (a) 1r., 71.91 (6) (d) 4., 224.46, 224.725 (1r), 705.06 (2m) and 812.19 (4) of the statutes; Relating to: P.O.D. accounts and loan obligations to financial institutions; the duty of a bank to make payment on a lost, destroyed, or stolen cashier's check, teller's check, or certified check; providing temporary authority to act as a mortgage loan originator while a license application is pending; property subject to garnishment or tax levy in possession of a financial institution; entities that provide to financial institutions electronic data processing services; loans to state banks by a Federal Home Loan Bank; and consolidating the Banking Review Board and Savings Institutions Review Board in the Department of Financial Institutions. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

P.O.D. accounts and loan obligations to financial institutions; the duty of a bank to make payment on a lost, destroyed, or stolen cashier's check, teller's check, or certified check; providing temporary authority to act as a mortgage loan originator while a license application is pending; property subject to garnishment or tax levy in possession of a financial institution; entities that provide to financial institutions electronic data processing services; loans to state banks by a Federal Home Loan Bank; and consolidating the Banking Review Board and Savings Institutions Review Board in the Department of Financial Institutions. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-26SenatePublished 11-26-2019
2019-11-26SenateReport approved by the Governor on 11-25-2019. 2019 Wisconsin Act 65
2019-11-19SenatePresented to the Governor on 11-19-2019 by directive of the President, pursuant to Senate Rule 44m (3)
2019-11-18SenateReport correctly enrolled
2019-11-12SenateReceived from Assembly concurred in
2019-11-12HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2019-11-12HouseRead a third time and concurred in
2019-11-12HouseRules suspended
2019-11-12HouseOrdered to a third reading
2019-11-12HouseRead a second time
2019-11-12HouseRules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
2019-11-07HousePlaced on calendar 11-12-2019 by Committee on Rules
2019-11-06HouseRead first time and referred to committee on Rules
2019-11-06HouseReceived from Senate
2019-11-05SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2019-11-05SenateRead a third time and passed
2019-11-05SenateRules suspended
2019-11-05SenateOrdered to a third reading
2019-11-05SenateSenate Amendment 2 adopted
2019-11-05SenateRead a second time
2019-11-01SenatePlaced on calendar 11-5-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2019-10-24SenateAvailable for scheduling
2019-10-24SenateReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions, Ayes 9, Noes 0
2019-10-24SenateReport adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions, Ayes 9, Noes 0
2019-10-24SenateExecutive action taken
2019-10-22SenateSenate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Marklein
2019-10-17SenateSenate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Risser
2019-10-10SenatePublic hearing held
2019-10-03SenateFiscal estimate received
2019-09-30SenateRepresentative Born added as a cosponsor
2019-09-27SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions
2019-09-27SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback