WI SB454 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 115.38 (1) (a) and 121.02 (1) (c) 3.; to repeal and recreate 118.016; and to create 119.44 (2) (bm) of the statutes; Relating to: reading readiness assessments and granting rule-making authority. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reading readiness assessments and granting rule-making authority. (FE)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-10-26 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 62 N: 32 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-25 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-25 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 5 rejected (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-25 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 4 rejected (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-25 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 3 adopted (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-17SenateFailed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
2022-05-17SenatePlaced on calendar 5-17-2022 pursuant to Joint Rule 82 (2)(a)
2021-11-05SenateReport vetoed by the Governor on 11-5-2021
2021-11-04SenatePresented to the Governor on 11-4-2021
2021-11-02SenateReport correctly enrolled
2021-11-02SenateLRB correction
2021-10-27SenateReceived from Assembly concurred in
2021-10-26HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2021-10-26HouseRead a third time and concurred in, Ayes 62, Noes 32, Paired 2
2021-10-26HouseRules suspended
2021-10-26HouseOrdered to a third reading
2021-10-26HouseRead a second time
2021-10-26HouseRules suspended to withdraw from calendar of 10-27-2021 and take up
2021-10-25HouseRead first time and referred to calendar of 10-27-2021 pursuant to Assembly Rule 45 (1)
2021-10-25HouseReceived from Senate
2021-10-25SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2021-10-25SenateRead a third time and passed, Ayes 20, Noes 12
2021-10-25SenateRules suspended
2021-10-25SenateOrdered to a third reading
2021-10-25SenateSenate Amendment 5 rejected, Ayes 20, Noes 12
2021-10-25SenateSenate Amendment 4 rejected, Ayes 20, Noes 12
2021-10-25SenateSenate Amendment 3 adopted, Ayes 20, Noes 12
2021-10-25SenateRead a second time
2021-10-25SenateSenate Amendment 5 offered by Senators Larson, Smith, Ringhand, Johnson, Erpenbach and Carpenter
2021-10-25SenateSenate Amendment 4 offered by Senators Larson, Smith, Ringhand, Johnson, Erpenbach and Carpenter
2021-10-22SenatePlaced on calendar 10-25-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2021-10-21SenateAvailable for scheduling
2021-10-21SenateReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 4, Noes 3
2021-10-21SenateReport adoption of Senate Amendment 3 recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 7, Noes 0
2021-10-21SenateExecutive action taken
2021-10-20SenateLRB correction
2021-10-20SenateLRB correction (Senate Amendment 3)
2021-10-19SenateSenate Amendment 3 offered by Senator Bernier
2021-10-13SenateSenate Amendment 2 offered by Senators Larson, Johnson and Smith
2021-10-13SenateSenate Amendment 1 offered by Senators Larson, Johnson and Smith
2021-10-11SenateLRB correction
2021-10-06SenatePublic hearing held
2021-08-03SenateFiscal estimate received
2021-07-21SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Education
2021-07-21SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2021/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb454
Texthttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2021/REG/SB454.pdf
Texthttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/enrolledbills/2021/REG/SB454.pdf
Amendmenthttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/amends/2021/REG/SB454-SA1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/amends/2021/REG/SB454-SA2.pdf
Amendmenthttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/amends/2021/REG/SB454-SA3.pdf
Amendmenthttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/amends/2021/REG/SB454-SA4.pdf
Amendmenthttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/amends/2021/REG/SB454-SA5.pdf
Supplementhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2021/related/fe/sb454/sb454_dpi.pdf
Supplementhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2021/related/records/senate/education/1642240.pdf
Supplementhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/lcamendmentmemos/2021/REG/SB454.pdf
Roll Callhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/votes/2021/sv0144
Roll Callhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/votes/2021/sv0145
Roll Callhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/votes/2021/sv0146
Roll Callhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/votes/2021/sv0147
Roll Callhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/votes/2021/av0136

Bill Comments

feedback