WI SB453 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-07 - Published 2-5-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-07 - Published 2-5-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: prior authorization of specially formulated nutritional supplements and replacements. (FE)
Title
Prior authorization of specially formulated nutritional supplements and replacements. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Patrick Testin [R] | Sen. Dale Kooyenga [R] | Rep. Rob Summerfield [R] | Sen. Jesse James [R] |
Sen. Rachael Cabral-Guevara [R] | Rep. Barbara Dittrich [R] | Rep. Donna Rozar [R] | Rep. Chuck Wichgers [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | Senate | Published 2-5-2022 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 2-4-2022. 2021 Wisconsin Act 125 |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 2-1-2022 by directive of the Majority Leader |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2022-01-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-01-20 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2022-01-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-01-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-01-20 | House | Read a second time |
2022-01-20 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2022-01-18 | House | Placed on calendar 1-20-2022 by Committee on Rules |
2022-01-18 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2022-01-18 | House | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2022-01-18 | House | Representative Cabrera added as a cosponsor |
2022-01-12 | House | Executive action taken |
2022-01-12 | House | Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor |
2022-01-06 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-12-06 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Health |
2021-10-25 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Read a second time |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-10-22 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-25-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-10-14 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-10-14 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2021-10-14 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2021-10-14 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-10-12 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-10-12 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Testin |
2021-07-14 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health |
2021-07-14 | Senate | Introduced |