WI SB449 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 30-6)
Status: Passed on December 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-06 - Published 12-4-2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 30-6)
Status: Passed on December 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-06 - Published 12-4-2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 20.455 (2) (f), 118.07 (4) (cf), 165.28 (2) and 165.88 (3) (b); and to create 165.88 (3m) of the statutes; Relating to: grants to schools to provide critical incident mapping data to law enforcement agencies. (FE)
Title
Grants to schools to provide critical incident mapping data to law enforcement agencies. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-10-26 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-28 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-28 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-06 | Senate | Published 12-4-2021 |
2021-12-06 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 12-3-2021. 2021 Wisconsin Act 109 |
2021-12-02 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 12-2-2021 |
2021-11-02 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2021-10-26 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-10-26 | House | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 94, Noes 0 |
2021-10-26 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-10-26 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-10-26 | House | Read a second time |
2021-10-26 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2021-10-25 | House | Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor |
2021-10-21 | House | Placed on calendar 10-26-2021 by Committee on Rules |
2021-10-21 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2021-09-28 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 31, Noes 0 |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Read a second time |
2021-09-24 | Senate | Placed on calendar 9-28-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-09-23 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-09-23 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 6, Noes 0 |
2021-09-23 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-09-16 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-09-13 | Senate | Representatives Plumer and Stubbs added as cosponsors |
2021-09-02 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-08-25 | Senate | Representatives Bowen and Steffen added as cosponsors |
2021-07-26 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-07-07 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2021-07-07 | Senate | Introduced |