WI SB444 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 13.172 (1), 13.48 (13) (a), 13.62 (2), 13.94 (4) (a) 1., 13.95 (intro.), 16.002 (2), 16.004 (4), 16.004 (5), 16.004 (12) (a), 16.045 (1) (a), 16.15 (1) (ab), 16.41 (4), 16.417 (1) (b), 16.52 (7), 16.528 (1) (a), 16.53 (2), 16.54 (9) (a) 1., 16.765 (1), 16.765 (2), 16.765 (5), 16.765 (6), 16.765 (7) (intro.), 16.765 (7) (d), 16.765 (8), 16.85 (2), 16.865 (8), 77.54 (9a) (a), 100.45 (1) (dm) and 230.03 (3); and to create 13.94 (1) (dt), 13.94 (1s) (c) 10., 19.42 (10) (t), 19.42 (13) (q), 20.195, 39.28 (7), 39.52, 39.54, 39.56, 40.02 (54) (n), 70.11 (38v), 224.30 (6) and chapter 239 of the statutes; Relating to: student loans, creating an authority to be known as the Wisconsin Student Loan Refinancing Authority, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Student loans, creating an authority to be known as the Wisconsin Student Loan Refinancing Authority, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-12-05 | Senate | Representative Spreitzer added as a cosponsor |
2019-10-21 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-10-09 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-10-07 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-10-07 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-09-30 | Senate | Representative Haywood added as a cosponsor |
2019-09-23 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities, Technical Colleges, Children and Families |
2019-09-23 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb444 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB444.pdf |