WI SB444 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-12)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-12)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 38.04 (4) (e) 8. and 343.71 (5) (h) of the statutes; Relating to: driver education instruction on human trafficking. (FE)
Title
Driver education instruction on human trafficking. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Universities and Technical Colleges, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-11-01 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-10-26 | Senate | Representative Tranel added as a cosponsor |
2017-10-12 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities and Technical Colleges |
2017-10-12 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb444 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB444.pdf |