WI SB443 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 440.70 (6) and 440.78 (3) (c); to amend 440.70 (5) and 440.80 (2) (b); and to create 440.70 (6) (b), 440.70 (6m), 440.78 (3) (c) 2. and 440.78 (5m) of the statutes; Relating to: the use of alkaline hydrolysis to cremate human remains, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, and requiring the exercise of rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
The use of alkaline hydrolysis to cremate human remains, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, and requiring the exercise of rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-10-10 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-10-01 | Senate | Representative C. Taylor added as a cosponsor |
2019-09-23 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2019-09-23 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb443 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB443.pdf |