WI SB437 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Published 3-4-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Published 3-4-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: the revenue limit ceiling for school districts. (FE)
Title
The revenue limit ceiling for school districts. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate Substitute Amendment 2 rejected (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Senate | Published 3-4-2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 3-3-2020. 2019 Wisconsin Act 176 |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 2-28-2020 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2020-02-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-02-20 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2020-02-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-02-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-20 | House | Read a second time |
2020-02-18 | House | Made a special order of business at 11:41 AM on 2-20-2020 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 21 |
2020-02-18 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2020-01-21 | House | Received from Senate |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 2 rejected, Ayes 19, Noes 14 |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Read a second time |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Senators Schachtner, Bewley, Smith, Johnson, Miller, Ringhand, Risser, Erpenbach, Carpenter and Larson |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Placed on calendar 1-21-2020 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-10-29 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senators Schachtner, Bewley, Larson and Johnson |
2019-10-29 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-10-16 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-09-23 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2019-09-23 | Senate | Introduced |