WI SB43 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 165.775 (3) (b) and 165.775 (4) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: a time limitation for processing sexual assault kits. (FE)
Title
A time limitation for processing sexual assault kits. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Andre Jacque [R] | Rep. David Murphy [R] | Rep. Janel Brandtjen [R] | Rep. Elijah Behnke [R] |
Rep. Ty Bodden [R] | Rep. Bob Donovan [R] | Rep. Chuck Wichgers [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2023-11-07 | Senate | Representative Gustafson added as a cosponsor |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Jacque |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Introduced |