WI SB428 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-4)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-4)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.380 (3) (dm) and 41.567 of the statutes; Relating to: rural creative economy grant program and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Rural creative economy grant program and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-11-22 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Feyen |
2021-09-17 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Representative Vruwink added as a cosponsor |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Sporting Heritage, Small Business and Rural Issues |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Introduced |