WI SB427 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 13.15 (2) (a); to amend 13.15 (2) (title), 13.22, 13.90 (1) (intro.) and 13.90 (1m) (a); and to create 13.97, 20.923 (4) (f) 6f., 20.923 (6) (fm) and 230.08 (2) (fr) of the statutes; Relating to: creating a Legislative Human Resources Office. (FE)
Title
Creating a Legislative Human Resources Office. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Laid on table |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Placed on the foot of the 11th order of business on the calendar of 6-30-2021 |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Placed on calendar 6-30-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Joint Committee on Finance |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Introduced |