WI SB426 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 30-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 30-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 16.705 (1b) (d) and 16.71 (5r); and to create 71.05 (6) (a) 30., 71.05 (6) (b) 57. and 224.55 of the statutes; Relating to: creating a child care reimbursement account program, providing an income tax subtraction for certain contributions to a child care reimbursement account, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Creating a child care reimbursement account program, providing an income tax subtraction for certain contributions to a child care reimbursement account, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2023-10-18 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2023-10-02 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Quinn |
2023-09-12 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-09-11 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-09-08 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Mental Health, Substance Abuse Prevention, Children and Families |
2023-09-08 | Senate | Introduced |