WI SB423 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-14)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 24.61 (3) (a) 2., 24.61 (3) (a) 3., 121.91 (3) (a) 1. and 281.61 (1) (am); and to create 24.61 (3) (a) 1. dm., 24.61 (3) (a) 3m., 118.07 (6), 121.91 (3) (a) 3. and 281.61 (8) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: lead testing of potable water sources in certain schools; providing loans for lead remediation in certain schools; and providing an exception to referendum restrictions for lead remediation. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lead testing of potable water sources in certain schools; providing loans for lead remediation in certain schools; and providing an exception to referendum restrictions for lead remediation. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-01SenateFailed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2020-02-12SenateSenator Jacque added as a coauthor
2020-01-23SenateFiscal estimate received
2020-01-23SenateAvailable for scheduling
2020-01-23SenateReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 5, Noes 0
2020-01-23SenateReport adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 2 recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 4, Noes 1
2020-01-22SenateExecutive action taken
2020-01-22SenateFiscal estimate received
2020-01-21SenateFiscal estimate received
2020-01-17SenateSenate Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Senators Cowles and Marklein
2020-01-10SenateFiscal estimate received
2020-01-08SenateFiscal estimate received
2020-01-03SenateSenate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Cowles
2019-10-16SenateFiscal estimate received
2019-10-02SenateFiscal estimate received
2019-10-02SenateFiscal estimate received
2019-10-01SenatePublic hearing held
2019-09-17SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
2019-09-17SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback