WI SB416 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-07 - Published 3-5-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-07 - Published 3-5-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 48.981 (9) (a) of the statutes; Relating to: reports of sexual abuse of children placed in out-of-home care.
Title
Reports of sexual abuse of children placed in out-of-home care.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | Senate | Published 3-5-2022 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 3-4-2022. 2021 Wisconsin Act 146 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 3-3-2022 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2022-02-22 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-22 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2022-02-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-02-22 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-22 | House | Read a second time |
2022-02-22 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2022-02-17 | House | Placed on calendar 2-22-2022 by Committee on Rules |
2021-12-07 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2021-10-25 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Read a second time |
2021-10-22 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-25-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Human Services, Children and Families, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-10-14 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Human Services, Children and Families |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Introduced |