WI SB416 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 118.292 (1v) and 118.292 (2) (c) of the statutes; Relating to: a pupil's possession and use of an epinephrine auto-injector.
Title
A pupil's possession and use of an epinephrine auto-injector.
Sponsors
Sen. Luther Olsen [R] | Sen. Richard Gudex [R] | Rep. Sandra Pasch [D] | Rep. Alvin Ott [R] |
Rep. Terese Berceau [D] | Rep. Jill Billings [D] | Rep. Tom Larson [R] | Rep. Tod Ohnstad [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2014-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Strachota |
2014-02-18 | House | Placed on calendar 2-20-2014 by Committee on Rules |
2014-01-30 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2014-01-22 | House | Received from Senate |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Read a second time |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Placed on calendar 1-22-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2013-12-20 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2013-12-20 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2013-12-20 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2013-12-18 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2013-12-18 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2013-12-17 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Olsen |
2013-12-03 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2013-12-03 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2013/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb416 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2013/REG/SB416.pdf |