WI SB408 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 21-6)
Status: Passed on March 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-18 - Published 3-18-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 21-6)
Status: Passed on March 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-18 - Published 3-18-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 134.405 (1) (f) 9. of the statutes; Relating to: regulating scrap dealer purchases of catalytic converters. (FE)
Title
Regulating scrap dealer purchases of catalytic converters. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-10-20 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-18 | Senate | Published 3-18-2022 |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 3-17-2022. 2021 Wisconsin Act 189 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 3-15-2022 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2022-01-25 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-01-25 | House | Representatives Subeck, Hesselbein and Shankland added as cosponsors |
2022-01-25 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2022-01-25 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-01-25 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-01-25 | House | Read a second time |
2022-01-25 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2022-01-20 | House | Placed on calendar 1-25-2022 by Committee on Rules |
2022-01-20 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2022-01-20 | House | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Consumer Protection, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2021-12-08 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-12-08 | House | Representative Skowronski added as a cosponsor |
2021-12-06 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Consumer Protection |
2021-10-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 31, Noes 0 |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Read a second time |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-20-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-10-06 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-10-06 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2021-10-06 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Representative Vining added as a cosponsor |
2021-09-21 | Senate | Senator Carpenter added as a coauthor |
2021-09-08 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-08-25 | Senate | Representative Hong added as a cosponsor |
2021-08-24 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-08-05 | Senate | Representative Cabrera added as a cosponsor |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Representative Sinicki added as a cosponsor |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Introduced |