WI SB407 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Introduced on September 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-10-03 - Public hearing held
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to repeal 118.14 (3) (b); to amend 118.14 (1) (a), 118.14 (3) (a), 121.004 (7) (c) 1. (intro.) and 121.004 (7) (cm); and to create 118.14 (3) (c) of the statutes; Relating to: the age at which a child may attend four-year-old kindergarten. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The age at which a child may attend four-year-old kindergarten. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-03SenatePublic hearing held
2019-10-02SenateFiscal estimate received
2019-09-30SenateSenator Johnson added as a coauthor
2019-09-16SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Education
2019-09-16SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback