WI SB402 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 48.649 of the statutes; Relating to: creating a foster parents' bill of rights. (FE)
Title
Creating a foster parents' bill of rights. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Andre Jacque [R] | Rep. Barbara Dittrich [R] | Rep. David Armstrong [R] | Rep. Janel Brandtjen [R] |
Rep. Rick Gundrum [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Jacque |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Jacque |
2021-10-14 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Representative Penterman added as a cosponsor |
2021-07-06 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Representative Wichgers added as a cosponsor |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Human Services, Children and Families |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Introduced |