WI SB40 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 33-2)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 33-2)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 40.51 (8), 40.51 (8m), 66.0137 (4), 120.13 (2) (g) and 185.983 (1) (intro.); and to create 609.847 and 632.728 of the statutes; Relating to: coverage of individuals with preexisting conditions and benefit limits under health plans.
Title
Coverage of individuals with preexisting conditions and benefit limits under health plans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Representative Bowen added as a cosponsor |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Representative Wittke added as a cosponsor |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Representative Petryk added as a cosponsor |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Representative Oldenburg added as a cosponsor |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Representative Allen added as a cosponsor |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Commissioner of Insurance report received pursuant to s.601.423(2), Wisconsin Statutes |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance, Licensing and Forestry |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Introduced |