WI SB4 | 2013 | October Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-11-12 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relating to: increasing the amount of the supplement to the federal historic rehabilitation tax credit. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increasing the amount of the supplement to the federal historic rehabilitation tax credit. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-11-12SenateFailed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2013-10-17SenateRepresentative Ohnstad added as a cosponsor
2013-10-17SenateSenate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Gudex
2013-10-15SenateAvailable for scheduling
2013-10-15SenateReport passage recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 13, Noes 3
2013-10-15SenateExecutive action taken
2013-10-15SenateFiscal estimate received
2013-10-15SenateLRB correction
2013-10-15SenatePublic hearing held
2013-10-14SenateRead first time and referred to Joint Committee on Finance
2013-10-14SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback