WI SB386 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Published 4-19-2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Published 4-19-2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 6.28 (2); and to amend 6.28 (1) and 17.29 of the statutes; relating to: voter registration at high schools and certain tribal schools.
Title
Voter registration at high schools and certain tribal schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-13 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 57 N: 37 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 17 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Refused to refer to committee on Transportation and Elections (Y: 16 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 17 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 17 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Refused to refer to committee on Transportation and Elections (Y: 16 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 17 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Senate | Published 4-19-2012 |
2012-04-06 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 4-6-2012. 2011 Wisconsin Act 240 |
2012-04-05 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-5-2012 |
2012-03-19 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled on 3-19-2012 |
2012-03-13 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2012-03-13 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2012-03-13 | House | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 57, Noes 37, Paired 2 |
2012-03-13 | House | Refused to place at the foot of the calendar of 3-13-2012 |
2012-03-13 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-03-13 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2012-03-13 | House | Read a second time |
2012-03-06 | House | Made a special order of business at 11:16 A.M. on 3-13-2012 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 22 |
2012-03-02 | House | Placed on calendar 3-6-2012 by committee on Rules |
2012-02-29 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2012-02-22 | House | Received from Senate |
2012-02-21 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2012-02-21 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 17, Noes 16 |
2012-02-21 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-02-21 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2012-02-21 | Senate | Refused to refer to committee on Transportation and Elections, Ayes 16, Noes 17 |
2012-02-21 | Senate | Senate amendment 2 laid on table, Ayes 17, Noes 16 |
2012-02-21 | Senate | Read a second time |
2012-02-20 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-21-2012 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2012-02-20 | Senate | Senate amendment 2 offered by Senator Erpenbach |
2012-02-16 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2012-02-16 | Senate | Report passage recommended by committee on Transportation and Elections, Ayes 3, Noes 1 |
2012-02-16 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2012-02-16 | Senate | Senate amendment 1 offered by Senator Erpenbach |
2012-02-09 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2012-01-19 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Transportation and Elections |
2012-01-19 | Senate | Introduced |