WI SB383 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 35-0)
Status: Introduced on May 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - Representative Steffen added as a cosponsor
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to create 252.045 of the statutes; Relating to: prohibiting proof of vaccination for COVID-19 as a condition of receiving business and government services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibiting proof of vaccination for COVID-19 as a condition of receiving business and government services.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-11SenateRepresentative Steffen added as a cosponsor
2021-06-08SenateRepresentative Edming added as a cosponsor
2021-06-02SenateRepresentative Allen added as a cosponsor
2021-05-25SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Health
2021-05-25SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback