WI SB376 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 29.088 (2m); and to create 29.088 (2m) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: the maximum height of pole traps.
Title
The maximum height of pole traps.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-12-12 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-12-12 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Sporting Heritage, Mining and Forestry, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2017-12-12 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2017-11-28 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-08-10 | Senate | Representative Tusler added as a cosponsor |
2017-08-03 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Sporting Heritage, Mining and Forestry |
2017-08-03 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb376 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB376.pdf |