WI SB374 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-5)
Status: Passed on December 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-06 - Published 12-4-2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-5)
Status: Passed on December 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-06 - Published 12-4-2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 323.70 (7) and 323.72 (5); to consolidate, renumber and amend 323.72 (3) (intro.) and (b); to amend 20.465 (3) (dr), 20.465 (3) (jt), 323.70 (3), 323.70 (4) (intro.), 323.71 (3), 323.71 (4) (b), 323.72 (title), 323.72 (1), 323.72 (2), 323.72 (4) and 895.483 (4); and to create 20.465 (3) (dv), 20.465 (3) (hm), 40.05 (2) (aw), 40.05 (2) (ax), 40.06 (8), 40.06 (9), 323.70 (3m), 323.72 (2m), 323.72 (6) and 323.72 (7) of the statutes; Relating to: a statewide urban search and rescue task force, regional emergency response teams, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
A statewide urban search and rescue task force, regional emergency response teams, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-28 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-28 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-28 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-06 | Senate | Published 12-4-2021 |
2021-12-06 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 12-3-2021. 2021 Wisconsin Act 104 |
2021-12-02 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 12-2-2021 |
2021-10-08 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2021-10-08 | Senate | LRB correction |
2021-09-29 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2021-09-28 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-09-28 | House | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 97, Noes 0 |
2021-09-28 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-09-28 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-09-28 | House | Read a second time |
2021-09-28 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from Senate message and take up |
2021-09-28 | House | Read |
2021-09-28 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 30, Noes 1 |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Read a second time |
2021-09-24 | Senate | Placed on calendar 9-28-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-09-24 | Senate | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2021-09-24 | Senate | Referred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2021-09-24 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-09-24 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs and Constitution and Federalism, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2021-09-24 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs and Constitution and Federalism, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2021-09-22 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-09-16 | Senate | Representative Knodl added as a cosponsor |
2021-09-15 | Senate | Senator Cowles added as a coauthor |
2021-09-01 | Senate | Senator Carpenter added as a coauthor |
2021-09-01 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor |
2021-08-18 | Senate | Representative Schraa added as a cosponsor |
2021-07-20 | Senate | Representative Snodgrass added as a cosponsor |
2021-07-19 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Ballweg |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-06-11 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs and Constitution and Federalism |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Introduced |