WI SB374 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 48-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 48-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 16.856, 19.36 (12), 84.062, 84.41 (3), 106.04, 111.322 (2m) (c) and 946.15; to renumber 84.06 (1) (b); to renumber and amend 84.06 (1) (a); to amend 19.36 (3), 20.395 (2) (fx), 20.395 (3) (cq), 20.395 (3) (cx), 20.765 (3) (ka), 43.17 (9) (a), 59.20 (3) (a), 59.52 (29) (a), 62.03 (1), 62.15 (1), 66.0903 (1) (c), 66.0903 (1) (f), 66.0903 (1) (g), 66.0903 (1) (j), 66.0907 (3) (d), 66.1103 (11) (b) 1., 84.06 (2) (a), 103.503 (1) (a), 103.503 (1) (c), 103.503 (1) (e), 103.503 (1) (g), 103.503 (2), 103.503 (3) (a) 2., 109.09 (1), 111.322 (2m) (d), 230.13 (1) (intro.), 233.13 (intro.), 341.35 (1) and 978.05 (6) (a); and to create 13.94 (3m), 20.395 (2) (fq), 59.52 (29) (c), 60.47 (2m), 62.15 (1m), 66.0901 (1m) (c), 84.06 (1) (c), 84.06 (1) (d), 84.06 (1) (e), 84.06 (1) (f), 84.06 (1) (g), 84.06 (2m), 84.54, 86.35, 103.503 (1) (fm), 103.503 (1) (j) and 341.35 (1m) of the statutes; Relating to: alternative highway project delivery methods; prevailing wage for public works projects; municipal approval of highway roundabouts; local referendum imposing a wheel tax; funding for and audit of the Department of Transportation; granting rule-making authority; and making appropriations. (FE)
Title
Alternative highway project delivery methods; prevailing wage for public works projects; municipal approval of highway roundabouts; local referendum imposing a wheel tax; funding for and audit of the Department of Transportation; granting rule-making authority; and making appropriations. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-12-04 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-08-15 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-08-03 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Veterans Affairs |
2017-08-03 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb374 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB374.pdf |