WI SB37 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 24-4)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 24-4)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to consolidate, renumber and amend 165.775 (4) (intro.) and (b); to amend 165.775 (3) (b) and 165.775 (4) (a); and to create 165.775 (4) (b) 2. and 3. of the statutes; Relating to: a time limit for processing sexual assault kits. (FE)
Title
A time limit for processing sexual assault kits. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senator Pfaff added as a coauthor |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senator Hesselbein added as a coauthor |
2023-11-06 | Senate | Senator Agard added as a coauthor |
2023-10-24 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2023-10-24 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2023-10-24 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2023-10-24 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2023-10-24 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Representative C. Anderson added as a cosponsor |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator James |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator James |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Introduced |