WI SB364 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-14)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-14)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 134.66 (title), 134.66 (1) (g), 134.66 (2) (a), (am), (b) and (cm) 1m., 134.66 (2m) (a), 134.66 (3), 139.345 (3) (a) (intro.), 139.345 (3) (b) 2., 139.345 (7) (a), subchapter IX (title) of chapter 254 [precedes 254.911], 254.916 (2) (intro.), 254.916 (3) (a), (b), (c) and (d), 254.916 (3) (f) 2., 254.92 (title), 254.92 (1), 254.92 (2), 254.92 (2m) (intro.) and 254.92 (3); and to create 134.66 (1) (jm), 254.911 (11) and 254.916 (2) (d) of the statutes; Relating to: raising the legal age for sale, purchase, and possession of cigarettes and nicotine and tobacco products, providing a legal age for sale, purchase, and possession of vapor products, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Raising the legal age for sale, purchase, and possession of cigarettes and nicotine and tobacco products, providing a legal age for sale, purchase, and possession of vapor products, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Health and Human Services, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Health and Human Services, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Marklein |
2019-10-10 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Representative Skowronski added as a cosponsor |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-08-22 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2019-08-22 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb364 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB364.pdf |