WI SB35 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 38-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-24 - Published 6-25-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 38-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-24 - Published 6-25-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 175.35 (title), 175.35 (1) (ar), 175.35 (2) (d), 175.35 (2g) (c) 4. c. and 941.237 (1) (cm) of the statutes; Relating to: waiting period for handgun purchases.
Title
Waiting period for handgun purchases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Decision of the Chair stands as the judgement of the Senate (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Decision of the Chair stands as the judgement of the Senate (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Decision of the Chair stands as the judgement of the Senate (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Decision of the Chair stands as the judgement of the Senate (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Decision of the Chair stands as the judgement of the Senate (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-24 | Senate | Published 6-25-2015 |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 6-24-2015. 2015 Wisconsin Act 22 |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 6-23-2015 |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2015-06-09 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-06-09 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2015-06-09 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-06-09 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-06-09 | House | Read a second time |
2015-06-09 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2015-06-03 | House | Placed on calendar 6-9-2015 by Committee on Rules |
2015-05-05 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2015-04-21 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Passed |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Read a third time |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Decision of the Chair stands as the judgement of the Senate, Ayes 19, Noes 13 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Point of order that Senate Amendment 5 was not germane well taken |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Decision of the Chair stands as the judgement of the Senate, Ayes 19, Noes 13 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Point of order that Senate Amendment 4 was not germane well taken |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Decision of the Chair stands as the judgement of the Senate, Ayes 21, Noes 12 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Point of order that Senate Amendment 3 was not germane well taken |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Read a second time |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Senate Amendment 5 offered by Senators Harris Dodd, Miller, Hansen, L. Taylor, Bewley, Risser and C. Larson |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Senate Amendment 4 offered by Senators Hansen, Wirch, L. Taylor, Carpenter, Harris Dodd, Miller and C. Larson |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Senate Amendment 3 offered by Senators Carpenter and L. Taylor |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Placed on calendar 4-21-2015 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Report introduction of Senate Amendment 2 by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Wanggaard |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Representative Vorpagel added as a cosponsor |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Introduced |