WI SB347 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-7)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-7)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 115.28 (44), 118.018 and 121.02 (1) (L) 1m. of the statutes; Relating to: requiring sexual abuse prevention education. (FE)
Title
Requiring sexual abuse prevention education. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Petrowski |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Petrowski |
2019-08-19 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-08-14 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2019-08-14 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb347 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB347.pdf |