WI SB344 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-5)
Status: Passed on March 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-18 - Published 3-19-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-5)
Status: Passed on March 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-18 - Published 3-19-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 440.962 (1) (a), 440.962 (1) (b), 440.962 (1) (c), 440.962 (1) (d) and 440.964; to renumber 440.96 (2); to renumber and amend 440.96 (1); to amend 440.965; and to create 440.96 (1g), 440.96 (1r) (b) 2., 440.96 (3), 440.962 (1) (am), 440.968 (1) (e), 440.9693 and 440.9696 of the statutes; Relating to: registration and the scope of practice of interior designers and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Registration and the scope of practice of interior designers and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-18 | Senate | Published 3-19-2022 |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 3-18-2022. 2021 Wisconsin Act 195 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 3-15-2022 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2022-02-23 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-23 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2022-02-23 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-02-23 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-23 | House | Read a second time |
2022-02-22 | House | Made a special order of business at 8:08 AM on 2-23-2022 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29 |
2022-02-22 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-22 | House | Received from Senate |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Read a second time |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-22-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Kooyenga |
2021-11-04 | Senate | Representative Penterman added as a cosponsor |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Legal Review and Consumer Protection, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-08-25 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-06-11 | Senate | Senator Roys withdrawn as a coauthor |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Legal Review and Consumer Protection |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Introduced |